NH SB152 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2023; Chapter 0099; Effective 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2023; Chapter 0099; Effective 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to New Hampshire workforce training programs.
Title
Relative to New Hampshire workforce training programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - OTP (Y: 250 N: 123 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - Divide (Y: 118 N: 255 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 122 N: 251 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - OTP (Y: 250 N: 123 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - Divide (Y: 118 N: 255 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 122 N: 251 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - Divide (Y: 118 N: 255 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 122 N: 251 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - OTP (Y: 250 N: 123 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - Divide (Y: 118 N: 255 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 122 N: 251 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2023; Chapter 0099; Effective 07/01/2023 |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/08/2023); Senate Journal 19 |
2023-06-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-1961e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/18/2023); Senate Journal 16 |
2023-05-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-1961e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/18/2023 |
2023-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 250-123 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 28 |
2023-05-04 | House | Divide (Rep. Hoell): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 118-255 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 26 |
2023-05-04 | House | FLAM # 2023-1642h (Reps. A. Lekas, Belcher): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 122-251 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 23 |
2023-04-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2023-04-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass SB152-FN 04/11/2023 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) |
2023-04-05 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-23 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Education |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/16/2023; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0525s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0525s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0525s, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |