NH SB152 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB152
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to third party inspections conducted pursuant to a planning board approval.
Title
Relative to third party inspections conducted pursuant to a planning board approval.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 4 |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 59 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2888s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2888s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2888s, 01/08/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/13/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB152 (Carry Over) 2019-12-06 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2888s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar