NH SB15 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 8 (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 8 (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Naming a portion of route 101 after the 101st Airborne Division Screaming Eagles.
Title
Naming a portion of route 101 after the 101st Airborne Division Screaming Eagles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 8 (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar) |
2013-10-08 | House | Retained Bill - Continued Executive Session: 10/23/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-09-04 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-08-21 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 9/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 ==RECESSED== |
2013-05-07 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/7/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 4/23/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 ==RECESSED== |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 31, PG.1073 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0013s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0013s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Special Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0013s, 2/14/13; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 1/15/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |