NH SB149 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to liquor samples.
Title
Relative to liquor samples.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: === RECONVENE === 2/19/13, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: === RECESSED === 2/5/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:50 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 2/5/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:50 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |