NH SB145 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a temporary change in the formula for school funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a temporary change in the formula for school funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18SenateRereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-09SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/18/2021; Senate Calendar 15
2021-02-11SenateRemote Hearing: 02/16/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback