NH SB145 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB145
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Summary
Relative to a temporary change in the formula for school funding.
Title
Relative to a temporary change in the formula for school funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-05 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/05/2022; Senate Calendar 49 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/18/2021; Senate Calendar 15 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/16/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB145 (Carry Over) 2021-10-18 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate