NH SB141 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 305; Effective 07/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study violence in schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study violence in schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-30SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 305; Effective 07/29/2019
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2550e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2550e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 54
2019-06-13SenateSen. Kahn Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1824h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 12
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1824h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 12
2019-05-08HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1824h (NT) for 05/23/2019 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 4
2019-04-18HouseExecutive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-03-27HousePublic Hearing: 04/03/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0646s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0646s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0646s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-30SenateHearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback