NH SB141 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7, Pg.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7, Pg.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring drivers who are residents of foreign countries to have insurance.
Title
Requiring drivers who are residents of foreign countries to have insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7, Pg.67 | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 2/23/11; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Hearing: 2/8/2011, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Senate Journal 3, Pg.38 |