NH SB130 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2021-0883s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to education freedom accounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to education freedom accounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Reconsideration (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29SenateSen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2021-0883s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateSen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on Laid on the Table, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0769s, and 2021-0814s and 2021-0885s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateThe Clerk is instructed to make the necessary administrative corrections to SB 130-FN, Senator Watters Floor Amendment 0885s, which referenced RSA 196-E:6,II and it should have referenced RSA 194-E:6, II. 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateSen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2021-0885s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2021-0814s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0769s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenatePending Motion Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0769s, 03/18/2021; Senate Calendar 15
2021-02-18SenateRemote Hearing: 03/02/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 12
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=923&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB130
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=914&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=914
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=157&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0130&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB130&ddlsponsors=&lsr=923
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=158&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0130&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB130&ddlsponsors=&lsr=923
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=159&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0130&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB130&ddlsponsors=&lsr=923
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=160&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0130&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB130&ddlsponsors=&lsr=923
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=161&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0130&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB130&ddlsponsors=&lsr=923
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=162&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0130&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB130&ddlsponsors=&lsr=923
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=164&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0130&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB130&ddlsponsors=&lsr=923
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=165&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0130&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB130&ddlsponsors=&lsr=923

Bill Comments

feedback