NH SB13 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB13
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to limited electrical energy producers and net energy metering.
Title
Relative to limited electrical energy producers and net energy metering.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 4 |
2020-03-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/25/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 59 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2873s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2873s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2873s, 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 03/19/2019, Room 103, State House, 08:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB13 (Carry Over) 2019-11-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2873s