NH SB13 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2873s
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to limited electrical energy producers and net energy metering.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to limited electrical energy producers and net energy metering.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2873s
2019-03-28SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-19SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-13SenateHearing: 03/19/2019, Room 103, State House, 08:00 am; Senate Calendar 14
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback