NH SB129 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/23/2023; Chapter 0107; Effective 08/22/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/23/2023; Chapter 0107; Effective 08/22/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the payment of costs for indigent persons involved in mediation services.
Title
Relative to the payment of costs for indigent persons involved in mediation services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/23/2023; Chapter 0107; Effective 08/22/2023 |
2023-06-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/08/2023); Senate Journal 19 |
2023-05-18 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 14 P. 8 |
2023-05-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/03/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 05/03/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2023; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9A |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |