NH SB129 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Law Without Signature 07/11/2017; Chapter 0226; Effective 07/11/2017; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a portion of the renewable energy fund to benefit low to moderate income residential customers, relative to electric renewable energy classes, relative to the class rate for biomass, and relative to requirements for incentive payments from the renewable energy fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring a portion of the renewable energy fund to benefit low to moderate income residential customers, relative to electric renewable energy classes, relative to the class rate for biomass, and relative to requirements for incentive payments from the renewable energy fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-01 - House - Table (Y: 90 N: 217 NV: 62 Abs: 23) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12SenateLaw Without Signature 07/11/2017; Chapter 0226; Effective 07/11/2017; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
2017-06-27SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-27HouseEnrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 25
2017-06-21SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2374e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-20HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2374e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 10
2017-06-08SenateSen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19
2017-06-01HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1818h: Motion Adopted DV 222-84 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 142
2017-06-01HouseAmendment #2017-1818h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 142
2017-06-01HouseLay on Table (Rep. Harrington): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 90-217 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 140
2017-05-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-05-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1818h for 06/01/2017 (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 18
2017-05-18HouseExecutive Session: 05/18/2017 Legislative Office Building 304
2017-05-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/16/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-04-25House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/09/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-04-25HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/09/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-04-04HousePublic Hearing: 04/11/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302-304
2017-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/09/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 10 P. 76
2017-03-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2017-0770s and 2017-0853s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-16SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2017-0853s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-0770s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0770s, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14
2017-02-08SenateHearing: 02/14/2017, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am, on proposed amendment #2017-0377s; Senate Calendar 10
2017-02-07SenateHearing: 02/14/2017, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 10
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback