NH SB123 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/19/2019; Chapter 0094; Effective 08/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to lost and unaccounted for gas, and relative to electric distribution companies investment in natural gas operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to lost and unaccounted for gas, and relative to electric distribution companies investment in natural gas operations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/19/2019; Chapter 0094; Effective 08/18/2019
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 45
2019-05-08HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/23/2019 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 11
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing: 04/24/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1196s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1196s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1196s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-21SenateHearing: 03/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback