NH SB121 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB121
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2217s
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2217s
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a state-based health exchange.
Title
Relative to a state-based health exchange.
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Rep. Christy Bartlett [D] | Rep. Lucy Weber [D] | Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2217s |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Hearing: 09/23/2021, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 36 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/01/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/10/2021, 08:45 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3 |
Same As/Similar To
SB121 (Carry Over) 2021-10-28 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2217s