NH SB121 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Failed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Failed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the distribution formula for meals and rooms tax revenue.
Title
Relative to the distribution formula for meals and rooms tax revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Hearing: 2/12/13, Room 103, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 4 |