NH SB118 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 302; Effective 07/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 302; Effective 07/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a child fatality review committee.
Title
Establishing a child fatality review committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] |
Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 213 N: 140 NV: 13 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 302; Effective 07/29/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2670e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2670e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2547c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report 2547c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 213-140 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 28 |
2019-06-27 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Camarota) 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 2 |
2019-06-20 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2547c Filed 06/13/2019; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2019-06-17 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Camarota Replaces Rep. Jurius 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 20 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/18/2019, 10:00 am, Room 103, State House |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Long, Berrien, Diggs, Jurius 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 44 |
2019-06-12 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Long): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 44 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Sherman, Hennessey, Gray; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1816h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 21 |
2019-05-23 | House | FLAM # 2019-1849h (Rep. Yokela): Amendment Failed DV 140-226 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 21 |
2019-05-23 | House | Amendment # 2019-1816h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 21 |
2019-05-23 | House | Reconsider Amendment 2019-1849h (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 21 |
2019-05-23 | House | FLAM # 2019-1849h (): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 21 |
2019-05-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-05-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1816h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 8 |
2019-04-30 | House | Executive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-04-24 | House | Public Hearing: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 11 P. 69 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0500s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0500s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0500s, 02/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | ==RECESSED== Hearing: 01/29/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:20 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |