NH SB112 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB112
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 176-155 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 176-155 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a council on the creative economy.
Title
Establishing a council on the creative economy.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. David Danielson [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Gidge [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. Tamara Le [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 176-155 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-04-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/02/2018 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 10 |
2018-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 04/10/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/03/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 50 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0009s, Regular Calendar 21Y-2N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2018-0009s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Special Order SB 112 to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB112 (Carry Over) 2017-11-29 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass