NH SB112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB112
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-29 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-29 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a council on the creative economy.
Title
Establishing a council on the creative economy.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gidge [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Rep. David Danielson [R] | Rep. Tamara Le [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Special Order SB 112 to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB112 (Carry Over) 2017-11-29 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass