NH SB111 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a bipartisan commission to evaluate New Hampshires response to Russian interference in our democracy.
Title
Establishing a bipartisan commission to evaluate New Hampshires response to Russian interference in our democracy.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |