NH SB111 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0205; Effective 09/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0205; Effective 09/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Making changes to the life and health insurance guaranty association.
Title
Making changes to the life and health insurance guaranty association.
Sponsors
Sen. David Pierce [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] |
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0205; Effective 09/04/2015 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2102 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2133e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/11/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2133-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/11/2015); House Journal 46, PG. 1991 |
2015-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1823 |
2015-05-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jun 3 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1628 |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session: 5/12/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/8/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1008s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1008s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1008s, 3/26/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing: 3/17/15, Room 100, State House, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |