NH SB107 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - III. Remainder Effective 10/03/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - III. Remainder Effective 10/03/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the general administration of regulatory boards and commissions.
Title
Relative to the general administration of regulatory boards and commissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-09 | Senate | III. Remainder Effective 10/03/2023 |
2023-08-09 | Senate | II. Section 68 Effective 08/04/2023 |
2023-08-09 | Senate | I. Section 64-66 of this act shall take effect as provided in Section 67 |
2023-08-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0212 |
2023-07-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 18 |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2240e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-07-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2240e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 16 |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Sen. Pearl Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/15/2023; Senate Journal 19 |
2023-06-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2012h 2023-2075h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 72 |
2023-06-08 | House | FLAM # 2023-2075h (Rep. C. McGuire): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 72 |
2023-06-08 | House | Amendment # 2023-2012h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 66 |
2023-06-05 | House | Removed from Consent (Reps. C. McGuire, Grote, Schuett, Simon, F. Davis, T. Lekas, Post, Gerhard, A. Lekas, D. McGuire) 06/05/2023 House Journal 15 P. 2 |
2023-05-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2012h 05/24/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-05-19 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2023-1943h: 05/22/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-05-01 | House | Executive Session: 05/24/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-03-28 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2023 01:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0587s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0587s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0587s, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/16/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |