NH SB105 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-143; House Journal 41, PG. 1757-1760
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-143; House Journal 41, PG. 1757-1760
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to child-resistant packaging for tobacco products and establishing a committee to study revising the indoor smoking act.
Title
Relative to child-resistant packaging for tobacco products and establishing a committee to study revising the indoor smoking act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 210 N: 143 NV: 10 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-143; House Journal 41, PG. 1757-1760 |
2015-04-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1455h (NT) |
2015-04-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for May 6 (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG. 1510 |
2015-04-29 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 5/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 4/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs (in recess of 3/12/2015); House Journal 26, PG. 1276 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1061s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment #2015-1061s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Sen. Carson moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Special Order SB 105 to the end of the Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/19/15; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 3/3/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |