NH SB104 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Part III Effective 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adopting omnibus legislation relative to the classification of state employee positions, reverse auctions, and the organization of the department of administrative services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting omnibus legislation relative to the classification of state employee positions, reverse auctions, and the organization of the department of administrative services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Reconsideration (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0597s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-16SenatePart III Effective 07/01/2021
2021-08-16SenatePart II Effective 10/09/2021
2021-08-16SenatePart I Effective 10/09/2021
2021-08-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 08/10/2021; Chapter 0202
2021-07-28HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-28SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-07-21SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2079e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-07-20HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2079e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-06-24SenateConference Committee Report # 2021-2005c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/24/2021; Senate Journal 20
2021-06-24HouseConference Committee Report 2021-2005c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/24/2021
2021-06-17HouseConference Committee Report # 2021-2005c Filed 06/10/2021; House Amendment
2021-06-16SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 06/16/2021, 08:30 am, Room 100, State House
2021-06-15HouseConferee Change: Rep. Sytek Replaces Rep. S. Pearson (McGuire becomes first named) 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 23
2021-06-14HouseConferee Change: Rep. McGuire Replaces Rep. Sytek 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 22
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. S. Pearson, Santonastaso, Sytek, P. Schmidt 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 16
2021-06-10HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 16
2021-06-10SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Reagan, Ricciardi, Prentiss; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-10SenateSen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1514h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 37
2021-06-03HouseAmendment # 2021-1514h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 37
2021-05-25HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1514h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 7
2021-05-10HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 05/18/2021 09:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/97887037548
2021-04-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 05/06/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99880150800
2021-04-21HousePublic Hearing: 04/27/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/93185691814 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-17HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 4 P. 50
2021-03-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0597s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-11SenateSen. Soucy Moved Reconsideration on Ought to Pass with Amendment, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0597s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0597s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0597s, 03/11/2021; Senate Calendar 14
2021-02-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0217s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4
2021-02-11SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0217s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4
2021-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0217s, 02/11/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2021-01-27SenateRemote Hearing: 02/03/2021, 09:40 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 9
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=403&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB104
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=398&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=398
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=398
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=398
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=123&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0104&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB104&ddlsponsors=&lsr=403
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=124&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0104&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB104&ddlsponsors=&lsr=403
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=125&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0104&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB104&ddlsponsors=&lsr=403
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=126&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0104&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB104&ddlsponsors=&lsr=403

Bill Comments 750

feedback