NH HR18 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the house judiciary committee to investigate former superior court justices Robert Morrill and James O'Neill and retired Grafton county superior court clerk Robert Muh for violations of law and constitutions.
Title
Directing the house judiciary committee to investigate former superior court justices Robert Morrill and James O'Neill and retired Grafton county superior court clerk Robert Muh for violations of law and constitutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 46 |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 27 |
2016-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 02/11/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/11/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 4 P. 24 |