NH HR15 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0131h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0131h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Condemning the Communist Party of China and the People's Republic of China.
Title
Condemning the Communist Party of China and the People's Republic of China.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Labranche [D] | Rep. Stacie-Marie Laughton [D] | Rep. Michael Yakubovich [R] | Rep. Linda Massimilla [D] |
Rep. Jose Cambrils [R] | Rep. Tim Baxter [R] | Rep. Katherine Prudhomme-O'Brien [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0131h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | Amendment # 2022-0131h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 01/20/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-01-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-01-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0131h (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |