NH HJR1 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 519-520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 519-520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making restitution to Jeffrey Frost for inappropriate prosecution.
Title
Making restitution to Jeffrey Frost for inappropriate prosecution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 519-520 |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 18 (Vote 8-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 247-248 |
2015-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2015 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 231 |