NH HCR8 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Lay House CalendarR8 on Table (Rep. Granger): Motion Adopted DV 247-99 02/15/2024 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Lay House CalendarR8 on Table (Rep. Granger): Motion Adopted DV 247-99 02/15/2024 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Applying to congress for a limited national convention for the exclusive purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution relative to elections.
Title
Applying to congress for a limited national convention for the exclusive purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution relative to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Lay House CalendarR8 on Table (Rep. Granger): Motion Adopted DV 247-99 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 |
2024-02-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-02-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/02/2024 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 6 P. 16 |
2024-01-24 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/09/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |