NH HCR7 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-107 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-107 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reaffirming support for the nation of Israel and the location of the embassy of the United States therein.
Title
Reaffirming support for the nation of Israel and the location of the embassy of the United States therein.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - OTP (Y: 175 N: 107 NV: 76 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 144 N: 160 NV: 54 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 119 N: 185 NV: 54 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - House - Table (Y: 150 N: 155 NV: 53 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 144 N: 160 NV: 54 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 119 N: 185 NV: 54 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - House - Table (Y: 150 N: 155 NV: 53 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-107 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-20 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Blasek): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 144-160 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-20 | House | FLAM # 2022-1078h (Rep. Labranche): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 119-185 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-20 | House | Lay House CalendarR0007 on Table (Rep. Wolf): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 150-155 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 01/21/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-01-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-01-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |