NH HCR25 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.954
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.954
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to amend the Internal Revenue Code to permit churches and other houses of worship to engage in political campaigns.
Title
Urging Congress to amend the Internal Revenue Code to permit churches and other houses of worship to engage in political campaigns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.954 | |
2011-03-01 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 22, PG.569 | |
2011-03-01 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 10-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.569 | |
2011-02-18 | House Executive Session: 2/24/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/17/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 195 |