NH HCR18 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.728
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.728
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring Merrill v. Sherburne to be void and of no force.
Title
Declaring Merrill v. Sherburne to be void and of no force.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.728 | |
2011-03-02 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.535 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-02-16 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 3:01 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 11, PG. 195 |