NH HCR1 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 262-75; House Journal 26, PG. 1249-1251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 262-75; House Journal 26, PG. 1249-1251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Rescinding all requests by the New Hampshire legislature for a federal constitutional convention.
Title
Rescinding all requests by the New Hampshire legislature for a federal constitutional convention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 262 N: 75 NV: 35 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 262-75; House Journal 26, PG. 1249-1251 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 7-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 433 |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 8:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 7, PG. 118 |