NH HB94 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to public access to advisory committee meetings under the right-to-know law.
Title
Relative to public access to advisory committee meetings under the right-to-know law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.324 | |
2011-02-03 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 12, PG.207-208 | |
2011-02-03 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 9 (Vote 16-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 12, PG.207-208 | |
2011-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/1/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-13 | House Division I Work Session: 1/20/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-13 | House Division I Work Session: 1/18/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/11/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-12-30 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 8, PG.130 |