NH HB78 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/19/2021 10:00 am
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to certificates of title and drivers' licenses for members of the United States foreign service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certificates of title and drivers' licenses for members of the United States foreign service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29HouseExecutive Session: 10/19/2021 10:00 am
2021-09-15HouseFull Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initiallyconvened.
2021-03-29HouseRetained in Committee
2021-02-19HouseExecutive Session: 02/19/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98257633759
2021-02-03HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98796113084 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 34

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback