NH HB686 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB686
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to calculating and funding the interim cost of an opportunity for an adequate education and extending the interest and dividends tax to capital gains.
Title
Relative to calculating and funding the interim cost of an opportunity for an adequate education and extending the interest and dividends tax to capital gains.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 46 |
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 10 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-10-02 | House | Division II Work Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-03-27 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-03-06 | House | Finance Division II Work Session: 03/13/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-02-28 | House | Finance Division II Work Session: 03/04/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Finance 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 37 |
2019-02-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0404h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-143 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 35 |
2019-02-28 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 139-203 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 33 |
2019-02-28 | House | Amendment # 2019-0404h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 29 |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0404h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 26 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-31 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/07/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 26 |
Same As/Similar To
HB686 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)