NH HB686 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Executive Session: 02/12/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to calculating and funding the interim cost of an opportunity for an adequate education and extending the interest and dividends tax to capital gains.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to calculating and funding the interim cost of an opportunity for an adequate education and extending the interest and dividends tax to capital gains.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-31HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/07/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback