NH HB683 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB683

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the rights of property owners abutting certain highways and railtrails.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the rights of property owners abutting certain highways and railtrails.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseDied on Table
2020-01-09HouseLay on Table (Rep. Flanagan): Motion Adopted DV 210-150 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 33
2019-11-13HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-11-13HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2828h (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 28
2019-10-30House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-10-09HouseFull Committee Work Session: 10/30/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-10-02House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-09-25HouseFull Committee Work Session: 10/09/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-09-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 09/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-09-03House==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/11/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2019-08-27HouseFull Committee Work Session: 09/03/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2019-08-20HouseFull Committee Work Session: 08/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-08-05HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 08/20/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-03-14HouseRetained in Committee
2019-03-06HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-02-28HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/08/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 25

Same As/Similar To

HB683 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback