NH HB683 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Pending: House Resources, Recreation and Development Committee
Hearing: Feb 26 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 305-307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the rights of property owners abutting certain highways and railtrails.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the rights of property owners abutting certain highways and railtrails.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback