NH HB678 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 561
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 561
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring an evaluation of vendor performance on certain state contracts.
Title
Requiring an evaluation of vendor performance on certain state contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 561 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 24-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 346 |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-02-04 | House | Division I Work Session: 2/10/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Finance; House Journal 12, PG. 235 |