NH HB670 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the cost of prescription drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the cost of prescription drugs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseEnrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17
2019-05-02SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-04-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-17SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0893h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 15
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0893h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 15
2019-03-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0893h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 6
2019-03-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-28House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-27HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-02-13House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/19/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback