NH HB66 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-26 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-26 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of deadly force by a law enforcement officer.
Title
Relative to the use of deadly force by a law enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris True [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Bob Greene [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-02-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 67 |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98584313159 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout theday (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 34 |