NH HB658 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to price increases of drugs under the managed care law.
Title
Relative to price increases of drugs under the managed care law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 14 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 6 |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/19/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 23 |