NH HB654 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0167; Effective date 7/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0167; Effective date 7/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure and renewal fees.
Title
Relative to licensure and renewal fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Kris Roberts [D] | Rep. John Cebrowski [R] | Rep. Frederick Rice [R] |
Rep. Peter Hansen [R] | Rep. Laura Jones [R] | Rep. Daniel Sullivan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0167; Effective date 7/1/2014. |
2014-06-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1907eba Adopted, Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment 1907e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/17/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 3/26/14, Room 100, State House, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2014-01-29 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2391h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-29 | House | Adopt Amendment #2391h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2391h for Jan 8 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 4 |
2013-10-29 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/13/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-10-29 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/13/2013 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-10-24 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/29/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-10-09 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/23/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-10-03 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/9/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-09-11 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/2/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-07-01 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/10/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-06-18 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/25/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-03-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 3/19/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing: 3/14/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 24, PG.673 |
2013-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.673 |
2013-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought To Pass for Mar 6 (Vote 15-3; Part I Regular Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.417 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.205 |