NH HB653 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB653
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1538s, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1538s, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to providing additional duties to the interbranch criminal and juvenile justice council.
Title
Relative to providing additional duties to the interbranch criminal and juvenile justice council.
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Berry [R] | Rep. Benjamin Baroody [D] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] | Rep. Aidan Ankarberg [R] |
Rep. Joe Alexander [R] | Rep. William Infantine [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1538s, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Hearing: 03/13/2024, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2465h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 |
2024-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2023-2465h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 |
2023-11-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2465h (NT) 11/15/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 7 |
2023-11-03 | House | Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 45 |
2023-11-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/08/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 45 |
2023-11-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/14/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 45 |
2023-10-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/09/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 42 |
2023-10-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/03/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 41 |
2023-10-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/02/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 41 |
2023-10-12 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 41 |
2023-10-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 House Calendar 41 |
2023-10-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/19/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 House Calendar 41 |
2023-09-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/06/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37 |
2023-09-13 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37 |
2023-09-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37 |
2023-09-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/05/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37 |
2023-09-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/29/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36 |
2023-09-06 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36 |
2023-08-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-08-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-08-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-08-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-24 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 24 |
2023-02-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2023 04:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
Same As/Similar To
HB653 (Carry Over) 2023-09-14 - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/06/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37