NH HB651 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 334; Eff: 10/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing the use of campaign funds for child care expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the use of campaign funds for child care expenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-21HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 334; Eff: 10/15/2019
2019-07-29HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-09HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2634e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2634e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2042s (Rep. Moynihan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 3
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2042s, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2042s, Division Vote 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2042s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to after Executive Departments and Administration, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2042s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/24/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:30 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0108h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 9
2019-02-27HouseAmendment # 2019-0108h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 9
2019-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0108h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 7
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback