NH HB650 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB650
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting suspension of driver's licenses due to nonpayment of fines or fees.
Title
Relative to prohibiting suspension of driver's licenses due to nonpayment of fines or fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Telerski [D] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] |
Rep. Amanda Bouldin [D] | Rep. Amy Bradley [D] | Rep. Dan Hynes [R] | Rep. George Sykes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 68 |
2023-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study HB650-FN 11/14/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 21 |
2023-11-01 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 11/14/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 House Calendar 44 |
2023-10-26 | House | Full Work Session: 10/31/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 House Calendar 43 |
2023-10-26 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 10/31/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 House Calendar 43 |
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 24 |
Same As/Similar To
HB650 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Retained in Committee