NH HB649 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-03 - House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/4/2012 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-03 - House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/4/2012 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Northern Pass Project to construct and operate transmission lines from the Canadian border to a proposed terminal in Franklin, New Hampshire.
Title
Relative to the Northern Pass Project to construct and operate transmission lines from the Canadian border to a proposed terminal in Franklin, New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Rep. James Aguiar [D] | Rep. Mary Cooney [D] | Rep. Laurie Harding [D] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-03 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/4/2012 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Science, Technology and Energy for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2434 | |
2012-01-11 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.542 | |
2011-10-27 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 4 (Vote 8-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2225 | |
2011-10-11 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-08-18 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/13/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301-303 | |
2011-03-22 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.825 | |
2011-03-16 | House Full Committee Work Session: 3/22/2011 10:16 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-03-15 | House Suspend House Rules to Allow Reporting Deadline to Be Extended No Later Than Mar 24 and House Action No Later Than Mar 31 (Reps Bettencourt & Wallner): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by Required Two-Thirds; House Journal 26, PG.693 | |
2011-03-10 | House Retained in Committee | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/10/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-02-23 | House Public Hearing: 3/9/2011 1:30 PM Representative's Hall | |
2011-02-23 | House Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 21, PG.479 | |
2011-02-23 | House Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by Rules Committee; House Journal 21, PG.479 |