NH HB636 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to forfeiture of property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to forfeiture of property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2015-11-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2507h for Jan 6 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 24
2015-09-21House==TIME CHANGE==Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2015-09-21House==RESCHEDULED==Executive Session: 10/27/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2015-09-18HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2015-09-18HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2015-08-24HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2015-05-12HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/10/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2015-02-19HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-19HouseExecutive Session: 2/19/2015 Legislative Office Building 208
2015-02-11HousePublic Hearing: 2/19/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2015-02-04HouseVacated from Criminal Justice and Public Safety and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 14, PG. 273
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 233

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback