NH HB634 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 35; I. Sec. 3 Eff: 11/01/2019 II. Rem. Eff. 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 35; I. Sec. 3 Eff: 11/01/2019 II. Rem. Eff. 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the licensure of individuals who forage for wild mushrooms for sale to others.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the licensure of individuals who forage for wild mushrooms for sale to others.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Rep. Peter Bixby [D] | Rep. John O'Connor [R] | Rep. Alisson Turcotte [D] |
Rep. William Marsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 35; I. Sec. 3 Eff: 11/01/2019 II. Rem. Eff. 05/15/2019 |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 42 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16 |
2019-04-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1544e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 126 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1544e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/18/2019); Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-28 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 61 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 30 |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 23 |