NH HB621 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a road usage fee and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing a road usage fee and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Norman Major [R] | Rep. John Graham [R] | Rep. Bill Ohm [R] | Rep. Susan Almy [D] |
Rep. Paul Henle [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Died on Table |
2017-02-15 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Hinch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/15/2017 (Vote 20-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 23 |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 22 |